+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (6)
On June 25, 2015 in the House:
- Adopted
On June 23, 2015 in the House:
- Withdrawn From Com
- Placed On Cal For 06/25/2015
On April 15, 2015 in the House:
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
On April 14, 2015 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Vote
June 25, 2015: R2 For Adoption
- Yeas: 106
- Present/NV: 2
- Absent: 12