+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (15)
On June 26, 2013 in the House:
- Ch. Res 2013-17
- Ratified
On June 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Ordered Enrolled
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Placed on Today's Calendar
- Passed 1st Reading
- Rec From House
On June 25, 2013 in the House:
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Passed 2nd Reading
On June 24, 2013 in the House:
- Placed On Cal For 06/25/2013
- Withdrawn From Com
On April 11, 2013 in the House:
- Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
- Passed 1st Reading
On April 10, 2013 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Votes (2)
June 25, 2013: Second Reading
- Yeas: 113
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 6
June 25, 2013: Second Reading
- Yeas: 49
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsors (16)
Type:
Primary Sponsor