+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (8)
On July 17, 2013 in the House:
- Adopted
On July 16, 2013 in the House:
- Postponed To 07/17/2013
- Added to Calendar
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
On February 5, 2013 in the House:
- Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
- Passed 1st Reading
On February 4, 2013 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Vote
July 17, 2013: R2 For Adoption
- Yeas: 73
- Nays: 35
- Present/NV: 6
- Absent: 6
+ − Sponsors (30)
Type:
Primary Sponsor