+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (16)
On May 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Regular Message Received From House
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
On May 7, 2021 in the House:
- Regular Message Sent To Senate
On May 6, 2021 in the House:
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Passed 3rd Reading
On May 5, 2021 in the House:
- Reptd Fav
- Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
- Reptd Fav
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Placed On Cal For 05/06/2021
On April 27, 2021 in the House:
- Reptd Fav
- Re-ref Com On Judiciary 1
On March 15, 2021 in the House:
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref to the Com on Federal Relations and American Indian Affairs, if favorable, Judiciary 1, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
On March 11, 2021 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Vote
May 6, 2021: Second Reading
- Yeas: 68
- Nays: 44
- Absent: 8
+ − Sponsors (25)
Type:
Primary Sponsor