+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (7)
On April 17, 2013 in the House:
- Adopted
On April 15, 2013 in the House:
- Placed On Cal For 04/17/2013
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Withdrawn From Com
On March 5, 2013 in the House:
- Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
- Passed 1st Reading
On February 28, 2013 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Vote
April 17, 2013: R2 For Adoption
- Yeas: 110
- Present/NV: 2
- Absent: 8
+ − Sponsors (54)
Type:
Primary Sponsor