+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (11)
On March 6, 2017 in the House:
- Adopted
- Ordered Engrossed
- Amend Adopted A1
- Reconsidered Adoption
On February 28, 2017 in the House:
- Adopted
On February 27, 2017 in the House:
- Placed On Cal For 02/28/2017
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Reptd Fav For Adoption
- Ref To Com On University Board of Governors Nominating
- Passed 1st Reading
On February 23, 2017 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Statute Amended
- No affected General Statutes
+ − Votes (4)
March 6, 2017: M6 Reconsider R2 For Adoption
- Yeas: 115
- Present/NV: 2
- Absent: 3
March 6, 2017: A1 Fraley R2 For Adoption
- Yeas: 115
- Present/NV: 2
- Absent: 3
March 6, 2017: R2 For Adoption
- Yeas: 116
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 3
February 28, 2017: R2 For Adoption
- Yeas: 112
- Present/NV: 2
- Absent: 6
+ − Sponsors (7)
Type:
Primary Sponsor