+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (7)
On April 10, 2013 in the House:
- Adopted
On April 3, 2013 in the House:
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Placed On Cal For 04/10/2013
On March 4, 2013 in the House:
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
On February 28, 2013 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Vote
April 10, 2013: R2 For Adoption
- Yeas: 118
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsors (55)
Type:
Primary Sponsor