+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (12)
On May 23, 2013 in the House:
- Adopted
On May 22, 2013 in the House:
- Placed On Cal For 05/23/2013
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
On May 21, 2013 in the House:
- Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
- Withdrawn From Cal
On May 20, 2013 in the House:
- Placed On Cal For 05/23/2013
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Withdrawn From Com
On February 28, 2013 in the House:
- Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
- Passed 1st Reading
On February 27, 2013 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Vote
May 23, 2013: R2 For Adoption
- Yeas: 111
- Absent: 9
+ − Sponsors (54)
Type:
Primary Sponsor