+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (22)
On June 20, 2016 in the House:
- Ratified
- Ch. Res 2016-17
On June 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Ordered Enrolled
On June 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Withdrawn From Cal
- Placed On Cal For 06/16/2016
On June 14, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reptd Fav
On June 13, 2016 in the Senate:
- Withdrawn From Com
- Re-ref Com On Select Committee on Nominations
On May 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- Special Message Received From House
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
On April 28, 2016 in the House:
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Special Message Sent To Senate
On April 27, 2016 in the House:
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
- Reptd Fav
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Placed On Cal For 04/28/2016
On April 26, 2016 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Votes (2)
June 16, 2016: Second Reading
- Yeas: 46
- Absent: 4
April 28, 2016: Second Reading
- Yeas: 105
- Present/NV: 2
- Absent: 12