+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (10)
On May 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
- Passed 1st Reading
- Rec From House
On May 1, 2013 in the House:
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Passed 2nd Reading
On April 22, 2013 in the House:
- Placed On Cal For 05/01/2013
- Withdrawn From Com
On April 15, 2013 in the House:
- Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
- Passed 1st Reading
On April 11, 2013 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Vote
May 1, 2013: Second Reading
- Yeas: 117
- Absent: 3
+ − Sponsors (24)
Type:
Primary Sponsor