+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (18)
On June 8, 2017 in the House:
- Ratified
- Ch. Res 2017-6
On June 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Ordered Enrolled
On June 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Withdrawn From Com
- Placed On Cal For 06/07/2017
On February 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
- Passed 1st Reading
- Regular Message Received From House
On February 28, 2017 in the House:
- Regular Message Sent To Senate
On February 27, 2017 in the House:
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Passed 3rd Reading
On February 22, 2017 in the House:
- Withdrawn From Com
- Placed On Cal For 02/27/2017
On February 13, 2017 in the House:
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
On February 8, 2017 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Votes (2)
June 7, 2017: Second Reading
- Yeas: 43
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 6
February 27, 2017: Second Reading
- Yeas: 114
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 5
+ − Sponsors (65)
Type:
Primary Sponsor