+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (18)
On April 29, 2013 in the House:
- Ch. Res 2013-9
- Ratified
On April 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Ordered Enrolled
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Placed on Today's Calendar
- Withdrawn From Com
On April 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Rec From House
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
On April 11, 2013 in the House:
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Passed 2nd Reading
On April 10, 2013 in the House:
- Placed On Cal For 04/11/2013
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Withdrawn From Com
On April 9, 2013 in the House:
- Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
- Passed 1st Reading
On April 8, 2013 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Votes (2)
April 25, 2013: Second Reading
- Yeas: 35
- Present/NV: 9
- Absent: 6
April 11, 2013: Second Reading
- Yeas: 104
- Present/NV: 6
- Absent: 10
+ − Sponsors (36)
Type:
Primary Sponsor