+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (8)
On May 6, 2013 in the House:
- Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
- Withdrawn From Cal
On May 2, 2013 in the House:
- Placed On Cal For 05/06/2013
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Reptd Fav
On February 4, 2013 in the House:
- Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
- Passed 1st Reading
On January 31, 2013 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsors (41)
Type:
Primary Sponsor