+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (12)
On May 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
- Passed 1st Reading
- Rec From House
On May 13, 2013 in the House:
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Passed 2nd Reading
On May 9, 2013 in the House:
- Placed On Cal For 05/13/2013
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Reptd Fav
On April 11, 2013 in the House:
- Assigned To Judiciary Subcommittee B
On March 21, 2013 in the House:
- Ref To Com On Judiciary
- Passed 1st Reading
On March 20, 2013 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Statute Amended
- C-V-2. -
+ − Vote
May 13, 2013: Second Reading
- Yeas: 114
- Present/NV: 2
- Absent: 4
+ − Sponsors (35)
Type:
Primary Sponsor