+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (20)
On March 9, 2017 in the House:
- Ch. Res 2017-2
- Ratified
On March 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Ordered Enrolled
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Placed on Today's Calendar
- Withdrawn From Com
On March 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
- Passed 1st Reading
- Special Message Received From House
On March 2, 2017 in the House:
- Special Message Sent To Senate
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Passed 2nd Reading
On March 1, 2017 in the House:
- Placed On Cal For 03/02/2017
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Reptd Fav
- Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
- Passed 1st Reading
- Rules Suspended
On February 28, 2017 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Statute Amended
- No affected General Statutes
+ − Votes (2)
March 8, 2017: Second Reading
- Yeas: 45
- Present/NV: 2
- Absent: 3
March 2, 2017: Second Reading
- Yeas: 114
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 5
+ − Sponsors (25)
Type:
Primary Sponsor