+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (23)
On March 13, 2017 in the House:
- Ch. Res 2017-3
- Ratified
On March 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Ordered Enrolled
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Passed 2nd Reading
On March 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed On Cal For 03/09/2017
- Withdrawn From Com
On March 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
- Reptd Fav
On March 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Re-ref to Education/Higher Education. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
- Withdrawn From Com
- Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
- Passed 1st Reading
- Regular Message Received From House
On March 2, 2017 in the House:
- Regular Message Sent To Senate
On March 1, 2017 in the House:
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Passed 2nd Reading
On February 28, 2017 in the House:
- Placed On Cal For 03/01/2017
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Reptd Fav
On February 27, 2017 in the House:
- Ref To Com On Education - Community Colleges
- Passed 1st Reading
On February 23, 2017 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Statute Amended
- 115D-2.1
+ − Votes (2)
March 9, 2017: Second Reading
- Yeas: 44
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 5
March 1, 2017: Second Reading
- Yeas: 117
- Absent: 3