+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (19)
On June 17, 2014 in the House:
- Ch. Res 2014-6
- Ratified
On June 16, 2014 in the Senate:
- Ordered Enrolled
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Passed 2nd Reading
On June 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed On Cal For 06/16/2014
- Reptd Fav
On May 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- Special Message Received From House
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref To Com On Commerce
On May 27, 2014 in the House:
- Special Message sent to the Senate
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Passed 2nd Reading
On May 23, 2014 in the House:
- Placed On Cal For 05/27/2014
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Reptd Fav
On May 15, 2014 in the House:
- Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
- Passed 1st Reading
On May 14, 2014 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Votes (2)
June 16, 2014: Second Reading
- Yeas: 49
- Absent: 1
May 27, 2014: Second Reading
- Yeas: 117
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor