+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (37)
On June 25, 2018 in the House:
- Ch. SL 2018-88
- Signed by Gov. 6/25/2018
On June 15, 2018 in the House:
- Pres. To Gov. 6/15/2018
- Ratified
On June 14, 2018 in the House:
- Ordered Enrolled
- Concurred In S Com Sub
- Added to Calendar
- Cal Pursuant 36(b)
On June 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- Special Message Sent To House
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Placed on Today's Calendar
- Reptd Fav
On June 14, 2018 in the House:
- Special Message Received For Concurrence in S Com Sub
On June 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
- Com Substitute Adopted
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
On June 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Re-ref to Health Care. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
- Withdrawn From Com
- Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
- Special Message Received From House
On June 12, 2018 in the House:
- Special Message Sent To Senate
On June 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed 1st Reading
On June 11, 2018 in the House:
- Ordered Engrossed
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Amend Adopted A5
- Amendment Ruled Out of Order A4
- Amend Adopted A3
On June 7, 2018 in the House:
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Amend Failed A2
- Amend Adopted A1
On June 6, 2018 in the House:
- Placed On Cal For 06/07/2018
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
On May 24, 2018 in the House:
- Ref To Com On Health
- Passed 1st Reading
On May 23, 2018 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
- 90
- 90-36
+ − Votes (2)
June 14, 2018: M11 Concur
- Yeas: 94
- Present/NV: 3
- Absent: 23
June 14, 2018: Second Reading
- Yeas: 44
- Absent: 6
+ − Sponsors (16)
Type:
Primary Sponsor