+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (30)
On June 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
- Withdrawn From Com
On June 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Re-ref to State and Local Government. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
- Withdrawn From Com
On June 14, 2018 in the House:
- Special Message Sent To Senate
On June 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
- Passed 1st Reading
- Special Message Received From House
On June 14, 2018 in the House:
- Ordered Engrossed
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Amend Adopted A3
On June 13, 2018 in the House:
- Placed On Cal For 06/14/2018
- Withdrawn From Cal
- Amendment Withdrawn A2
- Amend Recon A2
- Reconsidered 2nd Reading
- Reconsidered 3rd Reading
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Amend Adopted A2
- Amend Adopted A1
- Added to Calendar
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Withdrawn From Com
On June 6, 2018 in the House:
- Re-ref Com On Appropriations
- Reptd Fav
On May 24, 2018 in the House:
- Ref To Com On State and Local Government II
- Passed 1st Reading
On May 22, 2018 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
- 145
- 145-49
+ − Votes (2)
June 14, 2018: A3 Davis Second Reading
- Yeas: 105
- Absent: 15
June 14, 2018: Second Reading
- Yeas: 104
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 15
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor