+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (33)
On July 11, 2016 in the House:
- Ch. SL 2016-93
- Signed by Gov. 7/11/2016
On July 1, 2016 in the House:
- Pres. To Gov. 7/1/2016
- Ratified
On June 30, 2016 in the Senate:
- Ordered Enrolled
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Placed on Today's Calendar
- Withdrawn From Com
On June 27, 2016 in the Senate:
- Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
- Withdrawn From Cal
On June 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed On Cal For 06/27/2016
- Withdrawn From Cal
On June 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reptd Fav
On June 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Re-ref Com On Judiciary II
- Reptd Fav
On June 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Ref To Com On Agriculture/Environment/Natural Resources
- Passed 1st Reading
On June 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Regular Message Received From House
On June 15, 2016 in the House:
- Regular Message Sent To Senate
On June 14, 2016 in the House:
- Ordered Engrossed
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Amend Adopted A3
On June 13, 2016 in the House:
- Ordered Engrossed
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Amend Adopted A2
- Amend Adopted A1
On June 9, 2016 in the House:
- Placed On Cal For 06/13/2016
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
On April 28, 2016 in the House:
- Ref To Com On Agriculture
- Passed 1st Reading
On April 27, 2016 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Statutes Amended (10)
- 106 -
- 106-568.53 -
- 106-568.51 -
- 106-568.52 -
- 106-568.53A -
- 106-568.55 -
- 106-568.56 -
- 106-568.57 -
- 90-87 -
- 90 -
+ − Votes (6)
June 30, 2016: Second Reading
- Yeas: 47
- Absent: 3
June 14, 2016: A3 Dixon Third Reading
- Yeas: 112
- Absent: 8
June 14, 2016: Third Reading
- Yeas: 108
- Nays: 4
- Absent: 8
June 13, 2016: A1 Dixon Second Reading
- Yeas: 100
- Nays: 11
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 8
June 13, 2016: A2 McNeill Second Reading
- Yeas: 80
- Nays: 30
- Present/NV: 2
- Absent: 8
June 13, 2016: Second Reading
- Yeas: 108
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 8
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor