+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (39)
On June 15, 2018 in the House:
- Conf Com Reported
On June 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on Today's Calendar
- Conf Com Reported
On June 15, 2018 in the House:
- Conf Report Adopted
On June 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- Conf Report Adopted
On June 15, 2018 in the House:
- Ch. SL 2018-10
- Ratified
- Ordered Enrolled
- Added to Calendar
On June 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- Conf Com Appointed
On June 13, 2018 in the House:
- Conf Com Appointed
- Failed Concur In S Com Sub
On June 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed 3rd Reading
On June 12, 2018 in the House:
- Placed On Cal For 06/13/2018
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Special Message Received For Concurrence in S Com Sub
On June 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Special Message Sent To House
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Placed on Today's Calendar
- Reptd Fav
- Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
- Com Substitute Adopted
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
On June 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Re-ref to State and Local Government. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
- Withdrawn From Com
On May 31, 2018 in the Senate:
- Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
- Passed 1st Reading
- Special Message Received From House
On May 31, 2018 in the House:
- Special Message Sent To Senate
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Passed 2nd Reading
On May 30, 2018 in the House:
- Placed On Cal For 05/31/2018
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Reptd Fav
On May 24, 2018 in the House:
- Re-ref Com On State and Local Government I
- Withdrawn From Com
- Ref To Com On State and Local Government II
- Passed 1st Reading
On May 22, 2018 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Statute Amended
- 113-133.1
+ − Votes (2)
June 15, 2018: C RPT Adoption
- Yeas: 86
- Nays: 9
- Present/NV: 4
- Absent: 21
June 15, 2018: Conference Rpt Motion 8 To Adopt
- Yeas: 35
- Absent: 15