+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (12)
On June 7, 2018 in the House:
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Special Message Sent To Senate
On June 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- Special Message Received From House
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
On June 6, 2018 in the House:
- Reptd Fav
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Placed On Cal For 06/07/2018
On May 23, 2018 in the House:
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref To Com On Health
On May 22, 2018 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Vote
June 7, 2018: Second Reading
- Yeas: 106
- Present/NV: 2
- Absent: 12
+ − Sponsors (16)
Type:
Primary Sponsor