+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (31)
On June 30, 2017 in the House:
- Signed by Gov. 6/30/2017
- Ch. SL 2017-89
On June 27, 2017 in the House:
- Pres. To Gov. 6/27/2017
On June 26, 2017 in the House:
- Ratified
On June 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Ordered Enrolled
On June 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Withdrawn From Cal
- Placed On Cal For 06/22/2017
On June 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- Withdrawn From Cal
- Placed On Cal For 06/21/2017
On June 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reptd Fav
- Placed On Cal For 06/19/2017
On June 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reptd Fav
- Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
On June 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Withdrawn From Com
- Re-ref to Judiciary. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
On March 7, 2017 in the House:
- Regular Message Sent To Senate
On March 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Regular Message Received From House
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
On March 6, 2017 in the House:
- Amend Adopted A1
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Ordered Engrossed
On March 2, 2017 in the House:
- Passed 2nd Reading
On March 1, 2017 in the House:
- Placed On Cal For 03/02/2017
On February 28, 2017 in the House:
- Reptd Fav
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
On February 15, 2017 in the House:
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref To Com On Judiciary II
On February 14, 2017 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
+ − Votes (4)
June 22, 2017: Second Reading
- Yeas: 47
- Absent: 3
March 6, 2017: A1 Dollar Third Reading
- Yeas: 115
- Present/NV: 2
- Absent: 3
March 6, 2017: Third Reading
- Yeas: 116
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 3
March 2, 2017: Second Reading
- Yeas: 112
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 4
+ − Sponsors (34)
Type:
Primary Sponsor