+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (25)
On June 25, 2018 in the House:
- Ch. SL 2018-58
- Ratified
On June 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- Ordered Enrolled
- Passed 3rd Reading
On June 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Placed on Today's Calendar
- Reptd Fav
- Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
- Reptd Fav
On June 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- Re-ref to Finance. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
- Withdrawn From Com
On June 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
- Passed 1st Reading
- Special Message Received From House
On June 5, 2018 in the House:
- Special Message Sent To Senate
On June 4, 2018 in the House:
- Passed 3rd Reading
On June 1, 2018 in the House:
- Passed 2nd Reading
On May 31, 2018 in the House:
- Placed On Cal For 06/01/2018
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Reptd Fav
On May 30, 2018 in the House:
- Re-ref Com On Finance
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
On May 23, 2018 in the House:
- Ref to the Com on State and Local Government I, if favorable, Finance
- Passed 1st Reading
On May 22, 2018 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Statute Amended
- No affected General Statutes
+ − Votes (2)
June 21, 2018: Third Reading
- Yeas: 46
- Absent: 4
June 20, 2018: Second Reading
- Yeas: 47
- Absent: 3
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor