+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (12)
On March 2, 2017 in the House:
- Regular Message Sent To Senate
On March 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Regular Message Received From House
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
On March 1, 2017 in the House:
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Passed 3rd Reading
On February 28, 2017 in the House:
- Reptd Fav
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Placed On Cal For 03/01/2017
On February 15, 2017 in the House:
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref To Com On Education - K-12
On February 14, 2017 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Votes (2)
March 1, 2017: M4 Previous Question Second Reading
- Yeas: 92
- Nays: 24
- Present/NV: 2
- Absent: 2
March 1, 2017: Second Reading
- Yeas: 110
- Nays: 8
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsors (27)
Type:
Primary Sponsor