+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (14)
On May 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Ref To Com On Education/Higher Education
- Passed 1st Reading
- Rec From House
On May 9, 2013 in the House:
- Ordered Engrossed
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Amend Adopted A1
On May 8, 2013 in the House:
- Placed On Cal For 05/09/2013
- Withdrawn From Com
On May 7, 2013 in the House:
- Re-ref Com On Appropriations
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
On April 18, 2013 in the House:
- Ref to the Com on Education, if favorable, Appropriations
- Passed 1st Reading
On April 17, 2013 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Amendment
+ − Statutes Amended (3)
- 115C -
- 115C-12 -
- 115C-156.2 -
+ − Votes (2)
May 9, 2013: A1 Blackwell Second Reading
- Yeas: 110
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 3
- Absent: 5
May 9, 2013: Second Reading
- Yeas: 105
- Nays: 6
- Present/NV: 2
- Absent: 7
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor