+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (14)
On June 14, 2016 in the Senate:
- Regular Message Received From House
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref To Com On Finance
On June 14, 2016 in the House:
- Regular Message Sent To Senate
On June 13, 2016 in the House:
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Passed 3rd Reading
On June 9, 2016 in the House:
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Placed On Cal For 06/13/2016
On June 7, 2016 in the House:
- Withdrawn From Com
- Re-ref Com On Finance
On April 27, 2016 in the House:
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
On April 26, 2016 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
- 20
- 20-79.7
+ − Vote
June 13, 2016: Second Reading
- Yeas: 111
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 8
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor