+ − Summaries (7)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (40)
On August 20, 2021 in the House:
- Signed by Gov. 8/20/2021
- Ch. SL 2021-110
On August 10, 2021 in the House:
- Pres. To Gov. 8/10/2021
On August 9, 2021 in the House:
- Ratified
On August 5, 2021 in the House:
- Cal Pursuant 36(b)
- Added to Calendar
- Concurred In S Com Sub
- Ordered Enrolled
On August 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- Regular Message Sent To House
On August 4, 2021 in the House:
- Regular Message Received For Concurrence in S Com Sub
On August 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Passed 2nd Reading
On August 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reptd Fav
On July 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reptd Fav
- Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
On July 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
- Com Substitute Adopted
- Re-ref Com On Commerce and Insurance
On July 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- Withdrawn From Com
- Re-ref to Health Care. If fav, re-ref to Commerce and Insurance. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
On June 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Re-ref Com On Commerce and Insurance
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
- Com Substitute Adopted
On June 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Re-ref to Health Care. If fav, re-ref to Commerce and Insurance. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
- Withdrawn From Com
On May 12, 2021 in the House:
- Regular Message Sent To Senate
On May 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- Regular Message Received From House
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
On May 11, 2021 in the House:
- Added to Calendar
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Reptd Fav
- Serial Referral To Insurance Stricken
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
On February 17, 2021 in the House:
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref to the Com on Health, if favorable, Insurance, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
On February 16, 2021 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Votes (2)
August 5, 2021: M11 Concur
- Yeas: 106
- Nays: 5
- Absent: 8
August 3, 2021: Second Reading
- Yeas: 42
- Absent: 8
+ − Sponsors (37)
Type:
Primary Sponsor