+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (24)
On June 27, 2016 in the House:
- Signed by Gov. 6/27/2016
- Ch. SL 2016-34
On June 17, 2016 in the House:
- Pres. To Gov. 6/17/2016
On June 16, 2016 in the House:
- Ratified
On June 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Ordered Enrolled
On June 14, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reptd Fav
On June 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reptd Fav
- Re-ref Com On Finance
On May 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- Regular Message Received From House
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref to Judiciary II. If fav, re-ref to Finance
- Withdrawn From Com
- Re-ref to Judiciary I. If fav, re-ref to Finance
On May 12, 2016 in the House:
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Regular Message Sent To Senate
On May 11, 2016 in the House:
- Reptd Fav
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Placed On Cal For 05/12/2016
On April 26, 2016 in the House:
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref To Com On Judiciary I
On April 25, 2016 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Statutes Amended (3)
- 75A
- 75A-10
- 75A-10.3
+ − Votes (2)
June 15, 2016: Second Reading
- Yeas: 48
- Absent: 2
May 12, 2016: Second Reading
- Yeas: 109
- Present/NV: 4
- Absent: 6
+ − Sponsors (18)
Type:
Primary Sponsor