+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (18)
On June 16, 2016 in the House:
- Ratified
- Ch. SL 2016-15
On June 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Ordered Enrolled
On June 14, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reptd Fav
On May 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- Regular Message Received From House
On May 17, 2016 in the House:
- Regular Message Sent To Senate
On May 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref To Com On State and Local Government
On May 16, 2016 in the House:
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Passed 3rd Reading
On May 12, 2016 in the House:
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Placed On Cal For 05/16/2016
On April 26, 2016 in the House:
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref To Com On Local Government
On April 25, 2016 in the House:
- Filed