+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (26)
On June 22, 2016 in the House:
- Ratified
- Ch. SL 2016-22
On June 21, 2016 in the House:
- Concurred In S/Com Sub
- Ordered Enrolled
On June 20, 2016 in the House:
- Cal Pursuant 36(b)
- Placed On Cal For 06/21/2016
On June 16, 2016 in the House:
- Regular Message Received For Concurrence in S Com Sub
On June 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Regular Message Sent To House
On June 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Passed 3rd Reading
On June 14, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
- Com Substitute Adopted
On May 17, 2016 in the House:
- Regular Message Sent To Senate
On May 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- Regular Message Received From House
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref To Com On State and Local Government
On May 16, 2016 in the House:
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Passed 3rd Reading
On May 12, 2016 in the House:
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Placed On Cal For 05/16/2016
On May 4, 2016 in the House:
- Withdrawn From Com
- Re-ref Com On Local Government
On April 26, 2016 in the House:
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref To Com On Education - Community Colleges
On April 25, 2016 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Statutes Amended (5)
- 115D-15.1
- 115D-9
- 143-336
- 160A-20
- 160A-274