+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (23)
On June 21, 2018 in the House:
- Ch. SL 2018-17
- Ratified
On June 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Ordered Enrolled
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Placed on Today's Calendar
- Reptd Fav
- Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
- Reptd Fav
On June 18, 2018 in the Senate:
- Re-ref to State and Local Government. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
- Withdrawn From Com
On May 31, 2018 in the Senate:
- Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
On May 31, 2018 in the House:
- Regular Message Sent To Senate
On May 31, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed 1st Reading
- Regular Message Received From House
On May 30, 2018 in the House:
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Added to Calendar
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Reptd Fav
On May 17, 2018 in the House:
- Ref To Com On State and Local Government II
- Passed 1st Reading
On May 16, 2018 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Statute Amended
- No affected General Statutes
+ − Vote
May 30, 2018: Third Reading
- Yeas: 91
- Nays: 21
- Present/NV: 4
- Absent: 4