+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (16)
On June 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Withdrawn From Com
- Re-ref to Health Care. If fav, re-ref to Education/Higher Education
On April 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Regular Message Received From House
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref To Com On Commerce
On April 2, 2015 in the House:
- Regular Message Sent To Senate
On April 1, 2015 in the House:
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
- Re-ref Com On Finance
- Withdrawn From Com
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Added to Calendar
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Passed 3rd Reading
On February 23, 2015 in the House:
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref to the Com on Alcoholic Beverage Control, if favorable, Finance
On February 18, 2015 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Statutes Amended (3)
- 18B
- 18B-101
- 18B-112
+ − Vote
April 1, 2015: Second Reading
- Yeas: 111
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 2
- Absent: 4