+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (54)
On July 29, 2013 in the House:
- Ch. SL 2013-369
- Signed by Gov. 7/29/2013
On July 25, 2013 in the House:
- Pres. To Gov. 7/25/2013
On July 24, 2013 in the House:
- Ratified
On July 23, 2013 in the House:
- Ordered Enrolled
On July 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Conf Report Adopted
On July 23, 2013 in the House:
- Conf Report Adopted
On July 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on Today's Calendar
On July 23, 2013 in the House:
- Added to Calendar
- Conf Com Reported
On July 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Conf Com Reported
On July 16, 2013 in the House:
- Failed Concur In S Com Sub
- Conf Com Appointed
On July 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Conf Com Appointed
On July 15, 2013 in the House:
- Placed On Cal For 07/16/2013
- Withdrawn From Com
On June 18, 2013 in the House:
- Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
On June 17, 2013 in the House:
- Rec To Concur S Com Sub
- Rec From Senate
On June 13, 2013 in the House:
- Engrossed
On June 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Amend Failed A4
On June 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Amend Adopted A3
- Amend Failed A2
- Amend Adopted A1
On June 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
- Com Substitute Adopted
On June 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- Withdrawn From Com
- Re-ref Com On Judiciary I
On May 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
- Passed 1st Reading
- Rec From House
On May 7, 2013 in the House:
- Amend Tabled A9
- Amend Tabled A7
- Amend Tabled A8
- Amend Tabled A6
- Amend Tabled A10
- Amend Tabled A12
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Amend Tabled A11
On May 6, 2013 in the House:
- Amend Tabled A3
- Amend Tabled A1
- Amend Tabled A2
- Amend Tabled A4
- Amend Tabled A5
- Passed 2nd Reading
On May 1, 2013 in the House:
- Postponed To 05/06/2013
On April 30, 2013 in the House:
- Placed On Cal For 05/01/2013
On April 24, 2013 in the House:
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
On April 15, 2013 in the House:
- Ref To Com On Judiciary Subcommittee A
- Passed 1st Reading
On April 11, 2013 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Amendments (13)
+ − Statutes Amended (37)
- 14 -
- 15A -
- 17E -
- 20 -
- 113 -
- 122C -
- 113-291.1 -
- 122C-54 -
- 122C-54.1 -
- 14-269 -
- 14-269.2 -
- 14-269.3 -
- 14-269.4 -
- 14-277.2 -
- 14-315 -
- 14-316 -
- 14-402 -
- 14-404 -
- 14-406 -
- 14-415.10 -
- 14-415.12 -
- 14-415.17 -
- 14-415.18 -
- 14-415.21 -
- 14-415.23 -
- 14-415.27 -
- 14-415.3 -
- 14-7.35 -
- 14-7.36 -
- 14-7.37 -
- 14-7.38 -
- 14-7.39 -
- 14-7.40 -
- 14-7.41 -
- 15A-1340.16A -
- 15A-1382.2 -
- 20-187.2 -
+ − Votes (24)
July 23, 2013: Conference Rpt Motion 8 To Adopt
- Yeas: 32
- Nays: 14
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 2
July 23, 2013: C RPT Adoption
- Yeas: 73
- Nays: 41
- Absent: 6
July 16, 2013: M11 Not Concur
- Yeas: 96
- Nays: 18
- Present/NV: 2
- Absent: 4
June 13, 2013: Amendment 4
- Yeas: 14
- Nays: 31
- Absent: 5
June 13, 2013: Third Reading
- Yeas: 31
- Nays: 14
- Absent: 5
June 12, 2013: Second Reading
- Yeas: 32
- Nays: 16
- Absent: 1
June 12, 2013: Amendment 2
- Yeas: 16
- Nays: 32
- Absent: 1
June 12, 2013: Amendment 3
- Yeas: 48
- Absent: 1
June 12, 2013: Amendment 1
- Yeas: 39
- Nays: 8
- Absent: 2
May 7, 2013: A11 Luebke M3 To Lay On The Table Third Reading
- Yeas: 74
- Nays: 43
- Present/NV: 3
May 7, 2013: A12 Adams M3 To Lay On The Table Third Reading
- Yeas: 71
- Nays: 44
- Present/NV: 5
May 7, 2013: Third Reading
- Yeas: 78
- Nays: 42
May 7, 2013: A6 Riddell M3 To Lay On The Table Third Reading
- Yeas: 64
- Nays: 50
- Present/NV: 5
- Absent: 1
May 7, 2013: A7 Glazier M3 To Lay On The Table Third Reading
- Yeas: 69
- Nays: 45
- Present/NV: 5
- Absent: 1
May 7, 2013: A8 Insko M3 To Lay On The Table Third Reading
- Yeas: 74
- Nays: 42
- Present/NV: 4
May 7, 2013: A9 Harrison M3 To Lay On The Table Third Reading
- Yeas: 74
- Nays: 43
- Present/NV: 3
May 7, 2013: A10 Jackson M3 To Lay On The Table Third Reading
- Yeas: 69
- Nays: 45
- Present/NV: 6
May 6, 2013: A1 Luebke M3 To Lay On The Table Second Reading
- Yeas: 74
- Nays: 39
- Present/NV: 2
- Absent: 5
May 6, 2013: A3 Jackson M3 To Lay On The Table Second Reading
- Yeas: 71
- Nays: 41
- Present/NV: 3
- Absent: 5
May 6, 2013: A4 Harrison M3 To Lay On The Table Second Reading
- Yeas: 74
- Nays: 40
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 5
May 6, 2013: A5 Insko M3 To Lay On The Table Second Reading
- Yeas: 73
- Nays: 40
- Present/NV: 2
- Absent: 5
May 6, 2013: M4 Previous Question Second Reading
- Yeas: 73
- Nays: 40
- Present/NV: 2
- Absent: 5
May 6, 2013: Second Reading
- Yeas: 76
- Nays: 38
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 5
May 6, 2013: A2 Adams M3 To Lay On The Table Second Reading
- Yeas: 74
- Nays: 39
- Present/NV: 2
- Absent: 5
+ − Sponsors (28)
Type:
Primary Sponsor