+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On June 6, 2018 in the House:
- Amend Adopted A1
On June 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Special Message Received From House
On June 6, 2018 in the House:
- Amend Adopted A2
On June 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
On June 6, 2018 in the House:
- Special Message Sent To Senate
- Ordered Engrossed
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Passed 2nd Reading
On June 5, 2018 in the House:
- Withdrawn From Com
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Placed On Cal For 06/06/2018
On May 30, 2018 in the House:
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
- Re-ref Com On Appropriations
On May 17, 2018 in the House:
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref to the Com on Education - K-12, if favorable, Appropriations
On May 16, 2018 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Statutes Amended (12)
- 115C -
- 115C-105.75 -
- 115C-105.76 -
- 115C-316.1 -
- 115C-47 -
- 115C-5 -
- 115C-105.46 -
- 115C-105.48A -
- 115C-105.51 -
- 115C-105.57 -
- 115C-105.60 -
- 143B-931A -
+ − Votes (2)
June 6, 2018: A2 Black Second Reading
- Yeas: 115
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 4
June 6, 2018: Second Reading
- Yeas: 116
- Absent: 4
+ − Sponsors (40)
Type:
Primary Sponsor