+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (15)
On May 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Ref to Agriculture/Environment/Natural Resources. If fav, re-ref to Judiciary II. If fav, re-ref to Finance
- Passed 1st Reading
- Rec From House
On May 9, 2013 in the House:
- Ordered Engrossed
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Amend Adopted A1
- Added to Calendar
On May 8, 2013 in the House:
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
On May 6, 2013 in the House:
- Re-ref Com On Judiciary Subcommittee B
- Withdrawn From Com
On April 15, 2013 in the House:
- Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
- Passed 1st Reading
On April 11, 2013 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Amendment
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
+ − Votes (2)
May 9, 2013: A1 Glazier Second Reading
- Yeas: 115
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 2
- Absent: 2
May 9, 2013: Second Reading
- Yeas: 101
- Nays: 14
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 4
+ − Sponsors (29)
Type:
Primary Sponsor