+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (9)
On June 26, 2019 in the House:
- Reptd Fav Com Sub 3
- Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
On June 13, 2019 in the House:
- Reptd Fav Com Sub 2
- Re-ref Com On Finance
On May 22, 2019 in the House:
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
- Re-ref Com On Judiciary
On April 22, 2019 in the House:
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref to the Com on Commerce, if favorable, Judiciary, if favorable, Finance, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
On April 16, 2019 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor