+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (24)
On August 31, 2017 in the House:
- Ch. SL 2017-208
- Ratified
On August 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- Ordered Enrolled
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Passed 2nd Reading
On August 29, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reptd Fav
On August 28, 2017 in the House:
- Ordered Engrossed
On August 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Ref To Com On Redistricting
- Passed 1st Reading
- Special Message Received From House
On August 28, 2017 in the House:
- Special Message Sent To Senate
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Amend Adopted A3
- Amend Adopted A2
- Amend Failed A1
On August 25, 2017 in the House:
- Placed On Cal For 08/28/2017
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
On August 23, 2017 in the House:
- Re-ref Com On House Select Committee on Redistricting
- Withdrawn From Com
On August 22, 2017 in the House:
- Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
- Passed 1st Reading
On August 18, 2017 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Amendments (6)
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
- 120
- 120-2
+ − Votes (7)
August 30, 2017: Second Reading
- Yeas: 30
- Nays: 15
- Absent: 5
August 30, 2017: Third Reading
- Yeas: 30
- Nays: 15
- Absent: 5
August 28, 2017: A3 Lewis Second Reading
- Yeas: 111
- Present/NV: 3
- Absent: 6
August 28, 2017: A1 Pittman Second Reading
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 102
- Present/NV: 5
- Absent: 6
August 28, 2017: Third Reading
- Yeas: 65
- Nays: 47
- Present/NV: 2
- Absent: 6
August 28, 2017: Second Reading
- Yeas: 65
- Nays: 47
- Present/NV: 2
- Absent: 6
August 28, 2017: A2 Lewis Second Reading
- Yeas: 64
- Nays: 46
- Present/NV: 4
- Absent: 6