+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (9)
+ − Actions (45)
On October 20, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by Gov. 10/20/2015
- Ch. SL 2015-276
On October 1, 2015 in the House:
- Pres. To Gov. 10/1/2015
On September 30, 2015 in the House:
- Ratified
On September 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on Today's Calendar
On September 29, 2015 in the House:
- Failed Concur In S Com Sub
- Conf Com Appointed
On September 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- Conf Com Appointed
- Conf Com Reported
- Conf Report Adopted
On September 29, 2015 in the House:
- Conf Com Reported
- Added to Calendar
- Conf Report Adopted
- Ordered Enrolled
On September 24, 2015 in the House:
- Special Message Received For Concurrence in S Com Sub
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Placed On Cal For 09/29/2015
On September 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Special Message Sent To House
On September 24, 2015 in the House:
- Engrossed
On September 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Amend Adopted A1
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Passed 3rd Reading
On September 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
- Com Substitute Adopted
On September 22, 2015 in the Senate:
- Withdrawn From Com
- Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
On July 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
- Com Substitute Adopted
- Re-ref Com On Transportation
On July 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- Withdrawn From Com
- Re-ref to Judiciary I. If fav, re-ref to Transportation
On April 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- Regular Message Received From House
On April 30, 2015 in the House:
- Regular Message Sent To Senate
On April 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
On April 29, 2015 in the House:
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Added to Calendar
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Passed 3rd Reading
On April 22, 2015 in the House:
- Withdrawn From Com
- Re-ref Com On Judiciary I
On April 20, 2015 in the House:
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref To Com On Appropriations
On April 16, 2015 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Amendment
+ − Statutes Amended (23)
- 20
- 143
- 143-166.14
- 143-166.15
- 20-129
- 20-129.1
- 20-130.1
- 20-139.1
- 20-16.3
- 20-187.3
- 97-27
- 143B
- 106-145.13
- 143B-927
- 15A
- 126
- 126-35
- 15A-298
- 20-185
- 106
- 146
- 143-135
- 146-9
+ − Votes (6)
September 29, 2015: M11 Not Concur
- Yeas: 114
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 4
September 29, 2015: C RPT Adoption
- Yeas: 113
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 5
September 29, 2015: Conference Rpt Motion 8 To Adopt
- Yeas: 47
- Absent: 3
September 24, 2015: Amendment 1
- Yeas: 43
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 6
September 24, 2015: Second Reading
- Yeas: 43
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 6
April 29, 2015: Second Reading
- Yeas: 117
- Absent: 3
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor