+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (34)
On June 30, 2020 in the House:
- Signed by Gov. 6/30/2020
- Ch. SL 2020-52
On June 24, 2020 in the House:
- Ratified
- Pres. To Gov. 6/24/2020
On June 23, 2020 in the House:
- Concurred In S Com Sub
- Ordered Enrolled
On June 22, 2020 in the Senate:
- Amend Adopted A1
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Engrossed
- Special Message Sent To House
On June 22, 2020 in the House:
- Special Message Received For Concurrence in S Com Sub
- Cal Pursuant 36(b)
- Placed On Cal For 06/23/2020
On June 19, 2020 in the Senate:
- Reptd Fav
On June 18, 2020 in the Senate:
- Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
- Com Substitute Adopted
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
On June 9, 2020 in the Senate:
- Withdrawn From Com
- Re-ref to Judiciary. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
On May 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
- Passed 1st Reading
- Special Message Received From House
On May 6, 2019 in the House:
- Special Message Sent To Senate
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Added to Calendar
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Reptd Fav
On May 3, 2019 in the House:
- Reptd Fav
- Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
On April 22, 2019 in the House:
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref to the Com on Judiciary, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
On April 16, 2019 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (2)
June 23, 2020: M11 Concur
- Yeas: 115
- Absent: 5
June 22, 2020: Second Reading
- Yeas: 47
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 2