+ − Summaries (6)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (35)
On June 13, 2018 in the House:
- Ch. SL 2018-7
- Signed by Gov. 6/13/2018
- Pres. To Gov. 6/13/2018
On June 12, 2018 in the House:
- Ratified
On June 11, 2018 in the House:
- Ordered Enrolled
- Concurred In S Com Sub
On June 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- Special Message Sent To House
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Placed on Today's Calendar
- Reptd Fav
On June 7, 2018 in the House:
- Placed On Cal For 06/11/2018
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Special Message Received For Concurrence in S Com Sub
On June 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
- Com Substitute Adopted
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
- Re-ref Com On Finance
- Com Substitute Adopted
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
On June 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Re-ref to Education/Higher Education. If fav, re-ref to Finance. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
- Withdrawn From Com
On March 2, 2017 in the House:
- Regular Message Sent To Senate
On March 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
- Passed 1st Reading
- Regular Message Received From House
On March 1, 2017 in the House:
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Passed 2nd Reading
On February 28, 2017 in the House:
- Placed On Cal For 03/01/2017
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
On February 22, 2017 in the House:
- Serial Referral To Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House Stricken
On February 15, 2017 in the House:
- Ref to the Com on Transportation, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
- Passed 1st Reading
On February 14, 2017 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Statutes Amended (10)
- 120-19
- 120-19.4
- 120-3.1
- 120
- 115C
- 20
- 115C-270.21
- 115C-295
- 20-79.4
- 20-79.7
+ − Votes (3)
June 11, 2018: M11 Concur
- Yeas: 113
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 6
June 7, 2018: Second Reading
- Yeas: 43
- Absent: 7
March 1, 2017: Second Reading
- Yeas: 112
- Nays: 4
- Present/NV: 3
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsors (33)
Type:
Primary Sponsor