+ − Summaries (12)
+ − Full Texts (15)
+ − Actions (60)
On November 23, 2021 in the House:
- Signed by Gov. 11/23/2021
- Ch. SL 2021-184
On November 18, 2021 in the House:
- Ratified
- Pres. To Gov. 11/18/2021
On November 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Conf Report Adopted
On November 17, 2021 in the House:
- Conf Report Adopted
- Ordered Enrolled
On November 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Conf Com Reported
- Placed On Cal For 11/17/2021
On November 16, 2021 in the House:
- Conf Com Reported
- Cal Pursuant Rule 44(d)
- Placed On Cal For 11/17/2021
On October 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- Conferees Changed
On September 23, 2021 in the House:
- Failed Concur In S Com Sub
On September 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- Conf Com Appointed
On September 23, 2021 in the House:
- Conf Com Appointed
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Added to Calendar
- Withdrawn From Com
- Serial Referral to Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House Stricken
On September 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Engrossed
- Special Message Sent To House
On September 8, 2021 in the House:
- Special Message Received For Concurrence in S Com Sub
- Ref to the Com on Education - K-12, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
On September 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Amend Adopted A1
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Placed On Cal For 09/08/2021
On August 31, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reptd Fav
On August 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
- Com Substitute Adopted
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
On August 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Withdrawn From Com
- Re-ref to Education/Higher Education. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
On July 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
- Com Substitute Adopted
- Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
On July 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
- Com Substitute Adopted
- Re-ref Com On Finance
On July 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Withdrawn From Com
- Re-ref to Education/Higher Education. If fav, re-ref to Finance. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
On June 14, 2021 in the Senate:
- Withdrawn From Com
- Re-ref to Health Care. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
On March 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
- Regular Message Received From House
- Passed 1st Reading
On March 18, 2021 in the House:
- Regular Message Sent To Senate
On March 17, 2021 in the House:
- Reptd Fav
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Added to Calendar
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Passed 3rd Reading
On March 11, 2021 in the House:
- Reptd Fav Com Sub 2
- Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
On February 23, 2021 in the House:
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
- Re-ref Com On Finance
On February 17, 2021 in the House:
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref to the Com on Health, if favorable, Finance, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
On February 16, 2021 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (2)
November 17, 2021: C RPT Adoption
- Yeas: 71
- Nays: 43
- Absent: 6
November 17, 2021: Conference Rpt Motion 8 To Adopt
- Yeas: 41
- Nays: 7
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsors (42)
Type:
Primary Sponsor