+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (37)
On June 19, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by Gov. 6/19/2015
- Ch. SL 2015-98
On June 9, 2015 in the House:
- Pres. To Gov. 6/9/2015
On June 8, 2015 in the House:
- Ratified
On June 4, 2015 in the House:
- Concurred On 3rd Reading
- Ordered Enrolled
On June 3, 2015 in the House:
- Reptd Fav To Concur
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Ruled Material
- Added to Calendar
- Concurred On 2nd Reading
On June 2, 2015 in the House:
- Regular Message Received For Concurrence in S Com Sub
- Re-ref Com On Alcoholic Beverage Control
On June 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Regular Message Sent To House
On June 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed 3rd Reading
On May 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed 2nd Reading
On May 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
- Com Substitute Adopted
On May 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
- Com Substitute Adopted
- Re-ref Com On Finance
On May 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Withdrawn From Com
- Re-ref to Commerce. If fav, re-ref to Finance
On April 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- Special Message Received From House
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
On April 30, 2015 in the House:
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Special Message Sent To Senate
On April 29, 2015 in the House:
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Added to Calendar
- Passed 2nd Reading
On April 21, 2015 in the House:
- Reptd Fav
- Re-ref Com On Finance
On April 20, 2015 in the House:
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref to the Com on Alcoholic Beverage Control, if favorable, Finance
On April 15, 2015 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Statutes Amended (17)
- 18B
- 105
- 105-113.80
- 18B-1001
- 18B-101
- 18B-804
- 18B-902
- 105-113.68
- 105-113.81
- 105-113.83
- 105-164.4
- 18B-102
- 18B-1104
- 18B-1105
- 18B-112
- 18B-800
- 18B-903
+ − Votes (7)
June 4, 2015: Third Reading
- Yeas: 79
- Nays: 32
- Present/NV: 4
- Absent: 5
June 3, 2015: Motion 12 - Add to Cal.
- Yeas: 76
- Nays: 37
- Present/NV: 4
- Absent: 3
June 3, 2015: M11 Concur Second Reading
- Yeas: 72
- Nays: 44
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 3
June 1, 2015: Third Reading
- Yeas: 40
- Nays: 7
- Absent: 3
May 28, 2015: Second Reading
- Yeas: 40
- Nays: 8
- Absent: 2
April 30, 2015: Third Reading
- Yeas: 105
- Nays: 8
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 6
April 29, 2015: Second Reading
- Yeas: 112
- Nays: 8