+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (17)
On April 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- Regular Message Received From House
- Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
On April 30, 2015 in the House:
- Regular Message Sent To Senate
On April 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed 1st Reading
On April 29, 2015 in the House:
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Passed 3rd Reading
On April 28, 2015 in the House:
- Placed On Cal For 04/29/2015
On April 27, 2015 in the House:
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
- Serial Referral To Appropriations Stricken
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Withdrawn From Cal
- Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
- Withdrawn From Com
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
On April 16, 2015 in the House:
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref to the Com on Education - K-12, if favorable, Appropriations
On April 15, 2015 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Vote
April 29, 2015: Second Reading
- Yeas: 117
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsors (33)
Type:
Primary Sponsor