+ − Summaries (6)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (46)
On March 16, 2018 in the House:
- Ch. SL 2018-2
- Became Law W/o Signature
On February 13, 2018 in the House:
- Pres. To Gov. 2/13/2018
- Ratified
- Ordered Enrolled
- Conf Report Adopted
On February 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Conf Report Adopted
On February 8, 2018 in the House:
- Placed On Cal For 02/13/2018
- Withdrawn From Cal
On February 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed On Cal For 02/09/2018
On February 8, 2018 in the House:
- Placed On Cal For 02/09/2018
On February 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Withdrawn From Com
On February 8, 2018 in the House:
- Reptd Fav For Adoption
- Re-ref Com On Appropriations
On February 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Re-ref Com On Appropriations/Base Budget
On February 8, 2018 in the House:
- Conf Com Reported
On February 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Conf Com Reported
On February 8, 2018 in the House:
- Cal Pursuant Rule 44(d)
On February 7, 2018 in the House:
- Conferees Changed
On June 29, 2017 in the House:
- Conf Com Appointed
- Failed Concur In S Com Sub
On June 29, 2017 in the Senate:
- Conf Com Appointed
On June 28, 2017 in the House:
- Placed On Cal For 06/29/2017
- Cal Pursuant 36(b)
On June 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Passed 3rd Reading
On June 28, 2017 in the House:
- Special Message Received For Concurrence in S Com Sub
On June 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Special Message Sent To House
- Passed 2nd Reading
On June 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reptd Fav
On June 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
- Com Substitute Adopted
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
On May 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Re-ref to Education/Higher Education. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
- Withdrawn From Com
On March 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
- Passed 1st Reading
- Regular Message Received From House
On March 23, 2017 in the House:
- Regular Message Sent To Senate
On March 22, 2017 in the House:
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Passed 2nd Reading
On March 21, 2017 in the House:
- Placed On Cal For 03/22/2017
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
On February 15, 2017 in the House:
- Ref To Com On Education - K-12
- Passed 1st Reading
On February 14, 2017 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Statutes Amended (15)
- 115C-296
- 115C-296.11
- 115C
- 116-40.15
- 116
- 143B
- 163A
- 115C-105.25
- 115C-301
- 115C-591
- 115C-592
- 115C-595
- 143B-168.10B
- 143C-5-2
- 163A-2
+ − Votes (5)
February 13, 2018: C RPT Adoption
- Yeas: 104
- Nays: 12
- Absent: 4
February 9, 2018: Motion 8 To Adopt Conference Report
- Yeas: 37
- Nays: 5
- Absent: 7
June 29, 2017: M11 Not Concur
- Yeas: 111
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 8
June 28, 2017: Second Reading
- Yeas: 47
- Absent: 3
March 22, 2017: Second Reading
- Yeas: 117
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor