+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (25)
On June 11, 2019 in the House:
- Ratified
- Ch. SL 2019-24
On June 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Ordered Enrolled
On June 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reptd Fav
- Placed On Cal For 06/10/2019
On June 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reptd Fav
- Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
On May 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Withdrawn From Com
- Re-ref to State and Local Government. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
On February 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
- Regular Message Received From House
- Passed 1st Reading
On February 21, 2019 in the House:
- Regular Message Sent To Senate
On February 20, 2019 in the House:
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Passed 3rd Reading
On February 18, 2019 in the House:
- Reptd Fav
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Placed On Cal For 02/20/2019
On February 6, 2019 in the House:
- Reptd Fav
- Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
On January 31, 2019 in the House:
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref to the Com on State and Local Government, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
On January 30, 2019 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Vote
February 20, 2019: Second Reading
- Yeas: 111
- Present/NV: 3
- Absent: 6
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor