+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (35)
On June 22, 2018 in the House:
- Ch. SL 2018-25
- Signed by Gov. 6/22/2018
On June 14, 2018 in the House:
- Concurred In S Com Sub
- Ordered Enrolled
- Ratified
- Pres. To Gov. 6/14/2018
On June 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed 3rd Reading
On June 13, 2018 in the House:
- Cal Pursuant 36(b)
- Special Message Received For Concurrence in S Com Sub
On June 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Special Message Sent To House
- Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Placed on Today's Calendar
- Reptd Fav
- Com Substitute Adopted
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
On June 13, 2018 in the House:
- Placed On Cal For 06/14/2018
On June 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reptd Fav
- Re-ref Com On Pensions and Retirement and Aging
On June 11, 2018 in the Senate:
- Withdrawn From Com
- Re-ref to Select Committee on Elections. If fav, re-ref to Pensions and Retirement and Aging. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
On March 7, 2017 in the House:
- Regular Message Sent To Senate
On March 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Regular Message Received From House
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
On March 6, 2017 in the House:
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Passed 2nd Reading
On March 2, 2017 in the House:
- Placed On Cal For 03/06/2017
On March 1, 2017 in the House:
- Reptd Fav
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
On February 16, 2017 in the House:
- Withdrawn From Com
- Re-ref Com On Pensions and Retirement
On January 26, 2017 in the House:
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref To Com On State Personnel
On January 25, 2017 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Statutes Amended (3)
- 143 -
- 128 -
- 143-166.42 -
+ − Votes (3)
June 14, 2018: M11 Concur
- Yeas: 104
- Present/NV: 2
- Absent: 14
June 13, 2018: Second Reading
- Yeas: 47
- Absent: 3
March 6, 2017: Second Reading
- Yeas: 116
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 3
+ − Sponsors (13)
Type:
Primary Sponsor