+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (37)
On August 6, 2014 in the House:
- Ch. SL 2014-104
- Signed by Gov. 8/6/2014
On July 31, 2014 in the House:
- Pres. To Gov. 7/31/2014
- Ratified
- Ordered Enrolled
- Concurred In S/Com Sub
- Added to Calendar
- Special Message Received For Concurrence in S Com Sub
On July 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- Amend Adopted A1
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
- Re-ref Com On Appropriations/Base Budget
- Withdrawn From Com
- Placed on Today's Supplemental Calendar
- Com Substitute Adopted
- Amend Adopted A3
- Amend Failed A2
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Passed 3rd Reading
On July 30, 2014 in the House:
- Engrossed
On July 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- Special Message Sent To House
On July 29, 2014 in the Senate:
- Sequential Referral To Appropriations/Base Budget Added
- Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
- Withdrawn From Com
On May 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Rec From House
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref to Education/Higher Education. If fav, re-ref to Appropriations/Base Budget
On May 14, 2013 in the House:
- Ordered Engrossed
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Amend Adopted A1
- Placed On Cal For 05/14/2013
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
On May 13, 2013 in the House:
- Serial Referral To Appropriations Stricken
On April 15, 2013 in the House:
- Ref to the Com on Education, if favorable, Appropriations
- Passed 1st Reading
On April 11, 2013 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Statutes Amended (6)
- 115C-238.29D -
- 115C-238.29H -
- 115C-238.29H: -
- 115C-296. -
- 15C-238.29D -
- 115C-12 -
+ − Votes (6)
July 31, 2014: M11 Concur
- Yeas: 112
- Present/NV: 2
- Absent: 5
July 30, 2014: Amendment 1
- Yeas: 46
- Absent: 4
July 30, 2014: Amendment 3
- Yeas: 30
- Nays: 15
- Absent: 5
July 30, 2014: Second Reading
- Yeas: 45
- Absent: 5
May 14, 2013: A1 Hamilton Second Reading
- Yeas: 116
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 3
May 14, 2013: Second Reading
- Yeas: 115
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 3
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor