+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (22)
On June 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Re-ref to Finance. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
- Withdrawn From Com
On June 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
- Withdrawn From Com
On June 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Re-ref to Finance. If fav, re-ref to Agriculture/Environment/Natural Resources. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
- Withdrawn From Com
On May 31, 2017 in the House:
- Regular Message Sent To Senate
On May 31, 2017 in the Senate:
- Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
- Passed 1st Reading
- Regular Message Received From House
On May 30, 2017 in the House:
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Placed On Cal For 05/30/2017
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Withdrawn From Com
On May 26, 2017 in the House:
- Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
- Withdrawn From Cal
On May 23, 2017 in the House:
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
On April 25, 2017 in the House:
- Ref To Com On Finance
- Passed 1st Reading
On April 24, 2017 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Statutes Amended (4)
- 105
- 105-277.2
- 105-277.3
- 105-277.7
+ − Vote
May 30, 2017: Second Reading
- Yeas: 111
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 8
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor