+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (30)
On June 4, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by Gov. 6/4/2015
- Ch. SL 2015-58
On May 27, 2015 in the House:
- Pres. To Gov. 5/27/2015
On May 26, 2015 in the House:
- Ratified
On May 21, 2015 in the House:
- Concurred In S Amend SA1
- Ordered Enrolled
On May 20, 2015 in the House:
- Placed On Cal For 05/21/2015
On May 18, 2015 in the House:
- Cal Pursuant 36(b)
On May 14, 2015 in the House:
- Regular Message Received For Concurrence in S Amend
On May 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- Regular Message Sent To House
On May 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Amend Adopted A1
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Passed 3rd Reading
On May 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Withdrawn From Cal
- Placed On Cal For 05/13/2015
On May 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reptd Fav
On May 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Withdrawn From Com
- Re-ref Com On Judiciary II
On April 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Regular Message Received From House
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
On April 23, 2015 in the House:
- Regular Message Sent To Senate
On April 22, 2015 in the House:
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Added to Calendar
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Passed 3rd Reading
On April 15, 2015 in the House:
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref To Com On Judiciary II
On April 14, 2015 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Amendment
+ − Statutes Amended (13)
- 7B
- 7B-1701
- 7B-1903
- 7B-2101
- 7B-2202
- 7B-2203
- 7B-2404
- 7B-2408.5
- 7B-2506
- 7B-2507
- 7B-2510
- 7B-2512
- 7B-3200
+ − Votes (4)
May 21, 2015: M11 Concur Sen. Amd. 1
- Yeas: 108
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 7
- Absent: 4
May 13, 2015: Amendment 1
- Yeas: 50
May 13, 2015: Second Reading
- Yeas: 50
April 22, 2015: Second Reading
- Yeas: 110
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 3
- Absent: 4
+ − Sponsors (16)
Type:
Primary Sponsor